Accounts and annual returns BREATHE NORTH APPEAL LIMITED

Charity number: 327935
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2015 25 July 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2014 28 April 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2014 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2013 02 June 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2013 Not Required