Accounts and annual returns THE LOGOS TRUST

Charity Number: 327973
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 13 November 2024 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 03 January 2024 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 November 2022 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 March 2022 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 March 2021 130 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required