Financial history PANDIT RAM SAHAI SANGIT VIDYALAYA

Charity number: 328062
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £123.25k £139.87k £179.37k £181.49k £150.60k
Total expenditure £147.57k £130.17k £173.46k £176.08k £169.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A