Accounts and annual returns THE CLASSICAL HOMOEOPATHY TRUST

Charity number: 328161
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2007 17 October 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2006 06 February 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2005 02 May 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2004 07 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2004 Not Required