Financial history THE FLOW FOUNDATION

Charity number: 328274
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £110 £0 £0 £15 £11.16k
Total expenditure £49.37k £51.19k £19.77k £9.90k £21.70k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A