Financial history SEBAKWE BLACK RHINO TRUST

Charity number: 328461
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023 30/11/2024
Total gross income £41.81k £15.39k £7.56k £13.26k £24.48k
Total expenditure £11.21k £22.65k £12.32k £17.06k £17.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A