Financial history THE GERALD LOEWI MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 328467
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.83k £1.35k £1.84k £1.78k £2.29k
Total expenditure £1.22k £64 £0 £84 £60
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A