Financial history PWYLLGOR HARBWR ABERSOCH HARBOUR COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1064871
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £21.22k £2.18k £2.91k £2.75k £3.48k
Total expenditure £3.97k £1.17k £1.97k £6.62k £4.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £20.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A