Accounts and annual returns THE MALCOLM SARGENT CONCERT HALL TRUST

Charity Number: 1061945
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 14 December 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 23 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2007 25 November 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 31 October 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 30 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required