Governing document Shaftesbury Abbey CE VA Primary School PTFA
Charity Number: 1062348

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 OCTOBER 1988 AS AMENDED 22 APRIL 1997 AS AMENDED ON 18 SEPTEMBER 2003, AS AMENDED 12TH JULY 2005 as amended on 11 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.