Financial history THE ROMANIAN YOUTH SUPPORT TRUST

Charity number: 1062721
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011
Total gross income £12.63k £13.64k £30.40k £13.29k £13.71k
Total expenditure £4.56k £5.65k £15.23k £5.70k £9.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A