Financial history EASTFIELD ESTATES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1094530
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £7.10k £6.02k £15.11k £7.73k £13.00k
Total expenditure £7.45k £9.33k £11.82k £9.18k £6.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A £0