Financial history COVENTRY SCHOOL - BABLAKE PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1072221
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 11/10/2020 11/10/2021 11/10/2022 02/09/2023 02/09/2024
Total gross income £9.63k £2.76k £5.00k £9.46k £7.59k
Total expenditure £4.12k £2.77k £5.87k £9.60k £4.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A