Financial history NUNNEY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1061614
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £24.24k £37.21k £36.14k £70.48k £66.72k
Total expenditure £28.41k £34.10k £34.78k £47.79k £66.00k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A