Accounts and annual returns CAERPHILLY CARE FOR CARERS LIMITED

Charity Number: 1064267
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2018 19 December 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 19 December 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 December 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 December 2017 On Time