Financial history HOLMWOOD HOUSE EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity Number: 1062027
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2004 31/08/2005 31/08/2006 31/08/2007 31/08/2008
Total gross income £1 £1 £3 £5 £6
Total expenditure £0 £45 £15 £30 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A