Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF DIDCOT TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1064421
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £21.93k £464 £3 £3.10k £1.06k
Total expenditure £21.16k £6.70k £6.38k £3.10k £1.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A