Accounts and annual returns TANGMERE CHURCH DEVELOPMENT FUND

Charity number: 1062818
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2006 09 February 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2006 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2005 20 February 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2005 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2004 20 July 2005 81 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2004 Not Required