Financial history ASTHMA RELIEF

Charity number: 1063965
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £286.17k £238.12k £256.48k £244.91k £241.85k
Total expenditure £316.66k £214.65k £230.41k £229.06k £236.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £4.59k £4.00k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A