Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF CHERNOBYL'S CHILDREN ( WESHAM AND KIRKHAM)

Charity number: 1063658
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 23 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2023 21 May 2024 173 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2022 29 January 2023 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 14 March 2022 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 14 February 2021 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required