Financial history TREMAYNE HALL

Charity number: 1063268
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £24.69k £24.84k £18.36k £13.07k £18.15k
Total expenditure £15.91k £11.03k £18.76k £21.80k £25.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.60k £10.67k N/A £500