Accounts and annual returns THE AUDI DESIGN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1064159
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2008 24 July 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 24 July 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2007 16 June 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 23 June 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2006 19 October 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 24 October 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2005 27 July 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 27 July 2006 On Time