Accounts and annual returns EAST RIDING OF YORKSHIRE DISABLED SPORTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1064201
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 28 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 March 2022 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 February 2021 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 February 2021 14 days late
Annual return 31 March 2019 11 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 26 January 2020 On Time