Accounts and annual returns DEMENTIA VOICE

Charity number: 1069106
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2011 18 October 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 10 October 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2010 11 February 2011 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2009 28 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required