Financial history BRIMPSFIELD AND BIRDLIP PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1064812
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £42.27k £29.05k £44.36k £43.67k £43.67k
Total expenditure £43.49k £34.49k £35.48k £41.73k £41.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A