Financial history THE DONCASTER AND BASSETLAW HOSPITAL RADIO SERVICE

Charity number: 1064156
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £8.66k £4.80k £2.19k £1.82k £1.41k
Total expenditure £5.57k £5.19k £3.12k £3.20k £1.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A