Accounts and annual returns CRACKINGTON SURF LIFE SAVING CLUB

Charity number: 1067574
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 01 April 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 01 April 2009 03 March 2010 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2009 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2008 12 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2008 Not Required