Financial history GYMNASTIC TRUST LTD

Charity number: 1064878
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £199.31k £126.06k £176.42k £149.37k £241.36k
Total expenditure £206.14k £70.42k £141.68k £145.81k £214.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £12.90k N/A N/A