Accounts and annual returns RELATIVES OF DRUG ABUSERS

Charity number: 1066549
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 01 October 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2011 20 October 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 19 September 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2010 16 December 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 05 November 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 19 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 22 December 2009 On Time