Governing document BETJEMAN MILLENNIUM PARK
Charity number: 1064054

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13 MAR 1997 AS AMENDED ON 22 JUN 1997 AS AMENDED ON 04 AUG 1998 AS AMENDED ON 24 NOV 2016 as amended on 24 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION PRESERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF A PUBLIC PARK AND OTHER RECREATIONAL AMENITIES FORMERLY KNOWN AS "WHEELERS ORCHARD") ANY OTHER LAND OR AMENITY AS SHALL OR MAY AT ANY TIME BE VESTED IN THE CHARITY: FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
WANTAGE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.