Accounts and annual returns THE STAR CENTRE (HOUNSLOW) LIMITED

Charity number: 1066570
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2011 30 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2011 30 January 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2010 30 January 2012 364 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 25 March 2011 53 days late
Annual return 31 March 2009 10 December 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 11 December 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 14 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 17 January 2009 On Time