Financial history THE YOUTH CENTRE CEFN HENGOED

Charity Number: 1064236
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £49.66k £39.94k £9.64k £11.34k £13.32k
Total expenditure £54.11k £25.49k £6.90k £8.93k £16.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £17.82k £32.87k N/A £4.45k £7.13k