Financial history POW TRUST

Charity Number: 1073917
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2005 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009
Total gross income £1.00k £6.56k £9.30k £4.00k £1.88k
Total expenditure £500 £6.06k £8.43k £3.50k £1.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A