Financial history TOOTHILL COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1064423
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £37.72k £34.44k £36.93k £36.07k £30.20k
Total expenditure £32.88k £37.69k £37.22k £30.20k £33.61k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 £0