Trustees MOUNT ZION APOSTOLIC CHURCH

Charity number: 1068106
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Barry Chambers Chair 24 September 2020
None on record
Sean Deer Trustee 20 July 2023
MOUNT ZION APOSTOLIC CHURCH
Recently registered
Paulette Jeffery Trustee 14 January 2021
MOUNT ZION APOSTOLIC CHURCH
Recently registered
Charlyn Johnson Trustee 24 September 2020
MOUNT ZION APOSTOLIC CHURCH
Recently registered
LORNA FREDERICK Trustee 03 October 2011
MOUNT ZION APOSTOLIC CHURCH
Recently registered
ELDER TREVOR ANDERSON Trustee 01 January 2005
MOUNT ZION APOSTOLIC CHURCH
Recently registered