Financial history SUTTON-UNDER-WHITESTONCLIFFE VILLAGE INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1068375
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £2.43k £6.14k £7.76k £13.87k £9.49k
Total expenditure £3.75k £5.47k £10.22k £32.18k £11.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £950 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £1.00k N/A