Accounts and annual returns DAVID LLOYD GEORGE STATUE APPEAL TRUST

Charity number: 1064631
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 25 July 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 07 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 07 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 09 November 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 09 November 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 14 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2004 08 April 2005 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 08 April 2005 67 days late