Accounts and annual returns WARWICKSHIRE USER FORUM

Charity number: 1080848
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 12 December 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 12 December 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2010 14 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 13 January 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 18 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 25 January 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 26 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 28 January 2009 On Time