Accounts and annual returns LANDSCAPE AND ARTS NETWORK LIMITED

Charity number: 1073173
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 07 March 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 07 March 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 07 March 2021 08 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 07 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 07 March 2020 22 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 07 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 07 March 2019 02 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 07 March 2019 Not Required