Accounts and annual returns ROYAL MARINES RESERVE 50TH ANNIVERSARY RELIEF FUND

Charity Number: 1069629
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 16 July 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 16 July 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 08 October 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 26 November 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 12 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 12 December 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 21 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 21 November 2005 On Time