Financial history QUAINTON CHURCH OF ENGLAND COMBINED SCHOOL-SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1064697
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £24.31k £42.92k £26.78k £16.71k £1.43k
Total expenditure £22.55k £35.98k £1.14k £56.69k £573
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A