Financial history GEORGE HEIM MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 1069659
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 02/04/2018 02/04/2019 02/04/2020 02/04/2021 02/04/2022
Total gross income £4.72k £3.69k £400 £0 £0
Total expenditure £2.00k £3.80k £2.00k £0 £1.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A