Accounts and annual returns THE GRIMETHORPE, SHAFTON AND BRIERLEY COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP LIMITED

Charity number: 1070563
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 22 September 2008 235 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 14 November 2008 288 days late
Annual return 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 21 February 2008 386 days late
Annual return 31 March 2005 17 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 05 October 2006 247 days late