Accounts and annual returns RAF COTTESMORE CHILDREN'S GROUPS COMMITTEE

Charity Number: 1067044
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2005 12 July 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2005 12 July 2006 On Time