Financial history WESTERN KURDISTAN ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1066236
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017
Total gross income £670 £5.20k £1.20k £2.95k £197
Total expenditure £1.41k £3.76k £2.82k £1.06k £2.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A