Accounts and annual returns ST BARTHOLOMEW 'S CHURCH GREAT GRANSDEN RESTORATION TRUST

Charity number: 1065070
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2004 27 June 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2004 Not Required