Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF BROOKFIELD SCHOOL (POULTON-LE-FYLDE)

Charity Number: 1065136
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 01 April 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 01 April 2007 26 November 2008 299 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2007 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2006 07 April 2008 431 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2006 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2005 09 March 2006 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2005 Not Required