Financial history CARDIFF, ROATH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES

Charity Number: 1065297
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £4.21k £5.25k £8.81k £9.14k £9.13k
Total expenditure £8.41k £5.08k £8.52k £8.70k £7.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A