Financial history WICKWAR COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1069624
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.86k £4.57k £8.17k £11.07k £9.90k
Total expenditure £6.42k £4.35k £8.72k £13.84k £14.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A