Accounts and annual returns QUENINGTON SCULPTURE TRUST

Charity number: 1071956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 01 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window